Currington v. Crow et al (INMATE 4)
Plaintiff: DeAndre D. Currington
Defendant: John Crow, Steven T. Marshall, State of Alabama and Alabama Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2022cv00475
Filed: August 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Chad W Bryan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Address by DeAndre D. Currington. (am, )
October 3, 2022 Filing 24 Return Receipt Card showing service of #22 Amended Petition & #23 Order signed by Sondra Blackmon for Steven T. Marshall served on 9/30/2022, answer due 10/27/2022. (am, )
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Amend Petition; ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 10/27/2022; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of #22 amended petition to Warden John Crow & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 9/29/2022. (amf, )
September 22, 2022 Filing 22 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DeAndre D. Currington.(amf, )
September 22, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend #15 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DeAndre D. Currington. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Amended Petition)(am, )
September 22, 2022 Filing 20 Return Receipt Card showing service of #15 Amended Petition & #17 Order signed by Mary M. for John Crow served on 9/20/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (am, )
September 22, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Delene Rogan on behalf of John Crow, Steven T. Marshall (Rogan, Sara)
September 22, 2022 Filing 18 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by John Crow, Steven T. Marshall. (Rogan, Sara)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition no later than 10/7/2022, as further set out in Order; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copy of #15 Amended Petition to Warden John Crow; mailed w/copy of #15 Amended Petition to Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 9/19/2022. (am, )
September 15, 2022 Filing 16 BRIEF Summary filed by DeAndre D. Currington. (am, )
September 14, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DeAndre D. Currington.(am, )
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that Petitioner submit no later than 9/20/2022 an amended petition using the standard form for actions filed under 2254, as further set out in order. Petitioner's amended 2254 petition shall supersede his previous pleadings, as further set out in order. The Clerk of Court is hereby DIRECTED to provide Petitioner with the standard form for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 9/6/2022. (form mailed as directed)(cwl, )
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: denying #10 Motion to Request Permission to Subpoena Witness. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 9/6/2022. (cwl, )
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that the #8 motion to submit amended account balance (Doc. 8) is GRANTED; It is further ORDERED that the #3 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis likewise is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 9/1/2022. (am, )
September 1, 2022 Filing 11 Amended Account Balance by DeAndre D. Currington, docketed pursuant to the #12 Order. (am, )
August 31, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Request Permission to Subpoena Witness by DeAndre D. Currington. (am, )
August 31, 2022 Filing 9 Response to #6 Order, filed by DeAndre D. Currington. (am, )
August 31, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION Requesting Permission to Amend Certified Statement re: #3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by DeAndre D. Currington. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(am, )
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that Petitioner's #4 motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 8/26/2022. (am, )
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: DIRECTING that, on or before 9/9/2022, Petitioner shall either submit the $5.00 filing fee or file an account statement from the account clerk at Kilby Correctional Facility showing the balance in his prison account as of the date his 2254 petition was filed, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 8/26/2022. (am, )
August 26, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION Requesting Permission to Amend Documents as Evidence by DeAndre D. Currington. (am, )
August 24, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Request Appointment of Counsel by DeAndre D. Currington. (am, )
August 24, 2022 Filing 3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by DeAndre D. Currington. (am, )
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 8/29/2022, Currington shall either submit the $5.00 filing fee or file the appropriate affidavit supporting a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Currington a form for use in filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 8/15/2022. (furn: cashier) (form mailed as directed)(cwl, )
August 11, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DeAndre D. Currington. (NO IFP; NO FILING FEE)(bll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Currington v. Crow et al (INMATE 4)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAndre D. Currington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crow
Represented By: Sara Delene Rogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Represented By: Sara Delene Rogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?