Dean v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Alicia Dean
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2008cv00107
Filed: February 13, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Lowndes
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 24, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 21 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; and that this case is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with the Recommendation. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/24/2008. (cb, )
November 26, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the decision of the Commissioner be REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Objections to R&R due by 12/9/2008. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 11/26/2008. (cb, )
October 24, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the decision of the Commissioner be REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Objections to R&R due by 11/6/2008. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 10/24/2008. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Dean
Represented By: Quinn Eric Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?