Camp et al v. Correctional Medical Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Larry Camp and Sabrina Martindale
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services, Inc., Richard F. Allen, Ruth Naglich and Laura Ferrell
Case Number: 2:2008cv00227
Filed: March 27, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 65 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/17/2009. (wcl, )
January 12, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 54 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and that the plf's 44 Motion for an Emergency Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 1/12/2009. (wcl, )
December 23, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the 44 Motion for an Emergency Preliminary Injunction be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 1/5/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 12/23/2008. (cb, )
December 9, 2008 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that 33 Motion to Compel and 42 Motion for Protective Order are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as further set out; and that 33 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 12/9/2008. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camp et al v. Correctional Medical Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Camp
Represented By: David Wayne Long-Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Martindale
Represented By: David Wayne Long-Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard F. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Naglich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?