Cooley v. Prison Health Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Emmett Cooley
Defendant: Prison Health Services, Inc., Michael Edward Robbins, Bradford Adams, Don Cummins and Richard F. Allen
Case Number: 2:2008cv00313
Filed: April 24, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Talladega
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that a telephone status conference is set in this case for March 31, 2011 at 8:30 AM. arranged by counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/16/2011. (jg, )
February 1, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; that Plaintiff's Motion pursuant to Rule 56(d) 71 is DENIED. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(jg, )
March 25, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; The status conference set for Thursday, March 25, 2010, at 11:00 a.m. by conference call arranged by counsel for Plaintiff 52 is CONTINUED to Thursday, April 1, 2010, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel should be prepared to discuss potential trial settings in this case. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/25/2010. (jg, )
March 23, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Status Conference set for 3/25/2010 at 11:00 AM by conference call arranged by counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel should be prepared to discuss potential trial settings in this case. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/23/2010. (jg, )
January 4, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that upon consideration of plaintiff's 47 MOTION to Continue and defendants' 48 Response, the 44 Amended Scheduling Order entered September 3, 2009 is VACATED; that the pretrial conference and trial term setting in this case are CONTINUED indefinitely; that the parties are ORDERED to file a jointly prepared report on the status of the health of Plaintiff's counsel Julian P. Hardy, Jr. The first such report shall be filed on February 2, 2010; that the parties shall ther eafter file a jointly prepared report on the first Tuesday of every month until such time as the health of Plaintiff's counsel allows the case to resume. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/4/2010. (cc, ) Deadlines terminated: 09/29/2010 Pretrial and 10/25/2010 Jury Trial

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooley v. Prison Health Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett Cooley
Represented By: Madison Willis O'Kelley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Health Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Edward Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard F. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?