Wright v. Bates et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Willie James Wright
Defendant: Dr. Bates, Nurse Stricklen and Nurse Bailey
Case Number: 2:2008cv00965
Filed: December 8, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Mag Judge; and (2) defendants' 10 & 18 motion for summary judgment, as construed is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 3/1/11. (djy, )
March 4, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to File motion for appointment of counsel as further set out; denying 32 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 3/4/09. (vma, )
February 6, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to File a motion for reconsideration; as further set out in order; denying 23 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 2/6/09. (vma, )
January 28, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing 15 as a Motion for leave to file a Motion to Amend Complaint; motion granted as further set out in order; In light of the foregoing, it is Ordered that the motion to amend complaint to name Quality Correctional Health Care as a def endant be and is hereby denied. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 1/28/09. (vma, ) Modified on 2/6/2009 - to make correction and add additional text - ORDER construing 15 as a Motion for leave to file a Motion to Amend Complaint; motion granted as further set out in order; In light of the foregoing, it is Ordered that the motion to amend complaint to name Quality Correctional Health Care as a defendant be and is hereby denied.
December 9, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at MCDF; furn: cashier. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 12/9/08. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Bates et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie James Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Stricklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?