Gachett v. Rogers et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Alfonza Gachett
Defendant: Raymond Rogers, Curtis Pritchett and Bullock County Commission of Bullock County
Case Number: 2:2009cv00117
Filed: February 17, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of the defendants and that this case be and is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice with the costs of the proceedings taxed against the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 9/4/2009. (cb, )
August 7, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court (VACATED PER 26 ORDER] OPINION AND ORDER that this case be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 8/7/2009. (cb, ) Modified on 8/10/2009 (cb, ).
February 20, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Bullock County Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/20/2009. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gachett v. Rogers et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonza Gachett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Pritchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullock County Commission of Bullock County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?