Johnson v. Giles et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: David Lamar Johnson
Defendant: J. C. Giles, Alex Moses, Lt. Flowers, Sgt Noland, Caroyln Abercombie and Officer Stocks
Case Number: 2:2009cv00339
Filed: April 15, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that: (1) Johnson's 12 Objections are OVERRULED; and (2) The 11 Recommendation that the case be dismissed prior to service of process pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B) is ADOPTED, and the case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 7/30/2009. (wcl, )
June 23, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that Plf's complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice and prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); Objections to R&R due by 7/6/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/23/2009. (wcl, )
June 4, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: 1) denying 8 Motion for Extension of time seeking an additional 30 days to file amended complaint; 2) Plaintiff is granted an extension from 6/2/09 to and including 6/17/09 to file an amended complaint in accordance with the court's 5/12/09 order as further set out. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/4/09. (vma, )
May 12, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 6/2/09 Plaintiff shall File an amended complaint on a form for use in filing a 42 USC 1983 complaint as further set out in order; The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a form for use in filing a complaint under 42 USC 1983 to assist him in complying with the directives contained herein. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/12/09. ((form mailed as directed)(vma, )
April 16, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit filed by David Lamar Johnson as further set out. Filing Fee due by 5/7/2009; furn: cashier; account clerk at Ventress Corr Fac.. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/16/09. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Giles et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lamar Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroyln Abercombie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Stocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?