Bennett v. Alabama Dept. of Corrections et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Gloria D. Bennett
Defendant: Alabama Dept. of Corrections and Alabama Board of Pardon and Paroles
Case Number: 2:2009cv00933
Filed: October 6, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 4 Report and Recommendations; that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, prior to service of process, in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 11/16/2009. (cc, )
October 14, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Mag Judge that this case be dismissed with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the provisions of 28 USC § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); Objections to R&R due by 10/27/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/14/09. (djy, )
October 8, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Julia Tutwiler Prison for Women. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 10/8/2009. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Alabama Dept. of Corrections et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria D. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Board of Pardon and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?