Carlton v. Boyd et al (INMATE2)
Plaintiff: Alton Jay Carlton
Defendant: Louis Boyd, C. Davenport, S. Spann and Correctional Officer Gettis
Case Number: 2:2009cv00943
Filed: October 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that plaintiff's 18 MOTION to Dismiss be GRANTED; that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice; that no costs be taxed herein. Objections to R&R due by 1/19/2010. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/5/2010. (cc, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 11/13/2009. (dmn)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $32.79 be paid on or before 11/5/09 ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/15/09. Furnished to Cashier. (djy, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlton v. Boyd et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton Jay Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Spann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Gettis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?