Beasley v. Daniel et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Bobby R. Beasley
Defendant: Phillis Billups, Warden Daniel, James E. Steele, Dr. Benniqenq and Dr. Smith
Case Number: 2:2009cv01025
Filed: November 6, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: O Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: O
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERING and ADJUDGING that the 34 report and recommendation of the Mag Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED, and that this case be and is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice for the plaintiff's failure to comply with the orders of this court and his failure to properly continue the prosecution of this case. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/13/11. (djy, )
March 17, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 4/7/10 plf shall file a response to defendants' written reports, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 3/17/10. (djy, )
November 13, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 12/4/2009 plf shall forward to the Clerk the sum of $11.42 as an initial partial filing fee; directing that plf shall make monthly payments until the $350 filing fee is paid in full, as further set out in order; directing those persons having custody of plaintiff to forward said payments; granting 2 motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 11/13/09. Furnished to cashier.(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. Daniel et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillis Billups
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Daniel
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Steele
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Benniqenq
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Smith
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby R. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?