Owuor v. The U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security et al (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Peter Makusi Otemba Owuor
Defendant: Blake Diamond, The U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security, David Henderson, Ms. Taylor, The City of Montgomery and Bobby N. Bright
Case Number: 2:2009cv01166
Filed: December 28, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: (1) the 66 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (2) plaintiff's claims against defendant US Department of Homeland Security are DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisd iction; (3) the Motions for Summary Judgment filed on behalf of defs Diamond and Henderson are GRANTED and the claims asserted against these defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice; (4) the Motions for Summary Judgment filed on behalf of defendants Taylor, Bright, and City of Montgomery are GRANTED and the claims asserted against these defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/25/12. (djy, )
August 4, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 54 Motion for appointment of counsel. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 8/4/2010. (cc, )
January 12, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $17.73 be paid on or before 1/26/2010 ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk Elmore County Jail. **Copy of Order mailed to account clerk at Elmore County Jail. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 1/12/2010. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owuor v. The U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby N. Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Makusi Otemba Owuor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?