Hendrix v. Giles et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Hendrix
Defendant: J. C. Giles, CO Lowery, CO Walker and CO Merritt
Case Number: 2:2010cv00183
Filed: March 2, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that on or before June 21, 2010 the plaintiff shall file a response to the written report filed by the defendants as further set out. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 6/1/2010. (jg, )
April 20, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that the motion to amend be and is hereby DENIED; The plaintiff is advised that he may challenge the April 5, 2010 incident referenced in theinstant motion to amend by filing a separate 42 U.S.C. § 1983 action. To aid the plaintiff in filing an action, the Clerk is DIRECTED to return to the plaintiff the proposed amendment to the [6-2] and the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed in thereof [6-3]. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/20/2010. (jg, )
March 19, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; that the plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of each preceding month's income credited to his account as payments towards the $350.00 filing fee; that tho se persons having custody of the plaintiff shall forward the above described payments from the plaintiff's account to the clerk of this court each time the amount in the plaintiff's account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at Ventress Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 3/19/2010. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrix v. Giles et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?