Davis v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Michael Rhea Davis
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2010cv00505
Filed: June 14, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Chilton
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that: (1) plf's 19 application for attorney fees is GRANTED, and plf is awarded attorney fees pursuant to the EAJA in the total amount of $3,018.75; (2) the Commissioner is DIRECTED to send any check it issues to the plf in paymen t of such EAJA fees to the plf, in care of his attorney, Janet Cox, at Cox's address of record; (3) the petition for authorization of attorney's fees pursuant to 42 USC § 406(b), as amended (Doc. ## 26 , 28 ) is GRANTED, and plf' ;s counsel is authorized to collect the amount of $5,283.75 from plf's withheld past-due benefits for work performed before this court; and (4) plf's counsel is DIRECTED - if she collects the awarded EAJA fees from the plf - to refund to the plf the amount of $3,018.75. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/15/2014. (wcl, )
November 30, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that defendant file a response to the 19 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the EAJA on or before 12/14/2011, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/30/11. (djy, )
August 31, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/31/11. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rhea Davis
Represented By: Janet Pitts Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?