King v. Anderson, et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Albert King
Defendant: Dr. Gurley, Officer Anderson, D. T. Marshall, Officer Scarver, Nurse Baker, Wanda J. Robinson, Captain Christburg, Lt. Ford, Lt. Thrift and Officer Postell
Case Number: 2:2012cv00190
Filed: February 29, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Plaintiffs 120 motion for reconsideration of the motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is GRANTED. The courts August 4, 2014 order (Doc. # 117) is VACATED, and Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (Doc. # 115) is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 08/12/2014. (ydw, )
July 2, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing that Plaintiff's motion to alter, amend, or vacate the judgment, or in the alternative, for reconsideration, (Doc. # 110 ), is DENIED; further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to label and preserve the flash drive submitted to chambers as Exhibits E and N to Plaintiff's Documents 101 and 102 . Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/2/14. (scn, )
June 2, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that Defendants' motions for summary judgment (Docs. # 96 , 99 ) are GRANTED, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/2/14. (scn, )
March 22, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that: (1.) The plaintiff's 14 objection to the 9 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is overruled; (2.) The 9 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; (3.) The 1 motion for preliminary injunction filed by the plaintiff is DENIED; (4.) This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 3/22/12. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Anderson, et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gurley
Represented By: Wayne Paulk Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Anderson
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. T. Marshall
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Scarver
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Baker
Represented By: Wayne Paulk Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda J. Robinson
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Christburg
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Ford
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Thrift
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Postell
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?