McKinley v. Carter et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Chester Clyde McKinley
Defendant: Ruby Carter, Kenneth L. Jones and Leon White
Case Number: 2:2014cv00301
Filed: April 23, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Bullock
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that: 1. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. 2. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for the plaintiff's failure to comply with the orders of this court regarding the proper prosecution of this case. Final Judgment will be entered in accordance with this order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/27/2016. (kh, )
June 23, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE that: 1. The plaintiff's 26 Objection to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge filed on 6/19/2014 is overruled; 2. The 14 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge entered on 5/15/2014 is adopted; 3. The motion for preliminary injunction filed by the plaintiff is DENIED. 4. This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/23/2014. (dmn, )
June 5, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that: 1. The 14 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. 2. The 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by the plaintiff is DENIED. 3. This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/5/2014. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinley v. Carter et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Clyde McKinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Carter
Represented By: Kathryn Daubenberger Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Jones
Represented By: Kathryn Daubenberger Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon White
Represented By: Kathryn Daubenberger Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?