Bullock v. Jones et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Maurice Bullock
Defendant: Kenneth Jones, Rene Mason, Gwendolyn Babers, Dr. Kern, Chaplain Walker, M. Davis and Tahir Siddiq
Case Number: 2:2015cv00638
Filed: September 2, 2015
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2016 202 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge (doc. no. 200 ) is adopted. (2) The motion for preliminary injunction (doc. no. 96 ) and the motion to compel injunctive relief (doc. no. 100 ) are denied. This case is referred back to the magistrate judgefor further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/20/2016. (kh, )
November 21, 2016 196 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge (doc. no. 145 ) is adopted. (2) The motion for preliminarily injunction (doc. no. 116 ) is denied. This case is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/21/2016. (kh, )
December 2, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The 66 recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge is adopted; (2) The 49 motion for preliminary injunction is denied; further ORDERED that this case is referred back to the United States Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/2/2015. (wcl, )
November 2, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/2/2015. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullock v. Jones et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Jones
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Mason
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Babers
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kern
Represented By: William Alexander Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Mickey Jansen Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Walker
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahir Siddiq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?