Hutchins v. Myers et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Travis Hutchins
Defendant: Walter Myers, Patrice Richie, Capt. Cargill and Nathaniel Lawson
Case Number: 2:2016cv00324
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the 21 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED and that the plf's 15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; This civil action is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 2/9/2017. (wcl, )
July 28, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing 15 Motion for Restraining Order as containing a motion for a temporary restraining order and a motion for a preliminary injunction; ORDERED that Mr. Hutchins's 15 motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED; further ORDERED that Mr. Hutchins's 15 motion for a preliminary injunction is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/28/2016. (wcl, )
June 14, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the 6 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED and that the plf's 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; This civil action is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/14/2016. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchins v. Myers et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Myers
Represented By: Mary-Coleman Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Richie
Represented By: Mary-Coleman Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Cargill
Represented By: Mary-Coleman Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Lawson
Represented By: Mary-Coleman Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?