Parker v. Judicial Inquiry Commission of the State of Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Tom Parker
Defendant: Judicial Inquiry Commission of the State of Alabama, Billy C. Bedsole, David Scott, Randall L. Cole, Craig S. Pittman, David Thrasher, Ralph D. Malone, Augusta S. Dowd, Kim J. Chaney, David A. Kimberley and Luther Strange
Case Number: 2:2016cv00442
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2018 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that Justice Parker's 82 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, that the JIC's 92 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED, and that the JIC's 92 request for an immediate trial on the merits (Doc. # 92 , at ii n.2) is construed as a motion and DENIED; further ORDERED that Dfts are ENJOINED from enforcing Alabama Canon of Judicial Ethics 3A(6) to the extent that it proscribes public comme nt by a judge about a pending or impending proceeding in a court outside the state of Alabama, and Dfts are ENJOINED from enforcing the Canon to the extent that it proscribes public comment by a judge that cannot reasonably be expected to affect the outcome or impair the fairness of a proceeding in Alabama. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/2/2018. (alm, )
December 14, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: Dfts' 77 objection to discovery is OVERRULED, and Justice Parker's 77 motion for discovery is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/14/2017. (alm, )
September 29, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that Dfts' 12 and 13 motions to dismiss are GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/29/2016. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Judicial Inquiry Commission of the State of Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Parker
Represented By: Phillip Leo Jauregui
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judicial Inquiry Commission of the State of Alabama
Represented By: Samuel Holley Franklin
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy C. Bedsole
Represented By: Samuel Holley Franklin
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Scott
Represented By: Samuel Holley Franklin
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall L. Cole
Represented By: Samuel Holley Franklin
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig S. Pittman
Represented By: Samuel Holley Franklin
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Thrasher
Represented By: Samuel Holley Franklin
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph D. Malone
Represented By: Samuel Holley Franklin
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta S. Dowd
Represented By: Samuel Holley Franklin
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim J. Chaney
Represented By: Samuel Holley Franklin
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Kimberley
Represented By: Samuel Holley Franklin
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Strange
Represented By: James William Davis
Represented By: William G. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?