Webb v. United States of America (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: David Webb
Defendant: Donald Trump, Claude Hilton, Walter Woods, Jeff Sessions and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv00841
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
0 Judge: Charles S Coody
1 Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 15 NOTICE to COURT by David Webb (kh, )
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER denying #13 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/13/2018. (wcl, )
November 9, 2018 13 MOTION for Hearing by David Webb. (djy, )
November 5, 2018 12 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia under 28 U.S.C. 1631. Objections to R&R due by 11/19/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/5/2018. (kh, )
October 26, 2018 11 Response to Order re #8 Order, by David Webb. (alm, )
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER: It is ORDERED that petitioner's #9 objections are overruled. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/26/2018. (alm, )
October 23, 2018 9 Objection to #8 Order filed by David Webb. (kh, )
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER: Because the court is construing Webb's habeas petition as a 2255 motion, it is ORDERED that on or before October 31, 2018 Webb shall inform the court if his wishes to do one of the following: (1) Continue to proceed before this court under 28 U.S.C. 2255 on the claims he presents in the construed 2255 motion (Doc. #7 ); or (2) Amend the construed 2255 motion to assert any additional claims he wishes to assert under 2255 in challenging his conviction and sentence; or (3) Withdraw the construed 2255 motion and dismiss this action. It is further ORDERED that the United States of America shall henceforth be listed as the sole respondent in this case. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/17/2018. (kh, ) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/17/2018 to attach the correct pdf document) (kh, ). Modified on 10/17/2018 (kh,qc/wl ).
October 15, 2018 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by David Webb, construed in the court's #8 order (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #7 for pdf)(kh, )
October 15, 2018 7 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by David Webb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(kh, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER ON MOTION construing #5 NOTICE as a MOTION; denying #5 Motion for the court to declare the listed statements as law. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/10/18. (djy, )
October 9, 2018 MOTION for the court to declare the listed statements as law by David Webb. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #5 NOTICE). (djy, )
October 9, 2018 5 NOTICE (REQUEST FOR DECLARATION OF RIGHTS IN LAW) by David Webb (kh, )
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 OPINION AND ORDER: ORDERED that petitioner's objection (doc. no. #3 ) to the order of the United States Magistrate Judge is overruled, and his request for an Article III judge to handle all matters in this case (doc. no. #3 ) is denied. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and (3), the magistrate judge has been designated by this court to enter orders on certain pretrial matters and to enter proposed findings of fact and a recommendation to the district judge for disposition of the petition. The district judge will decide whether to adopt the recommendation after hearing objections from the petitioner and/or respondents. The provisions requiring the parties to consent to a magistrate judge's jurisdiction do not apply when the district judge retains final authority to decide the case. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/9/2018. (kh, )
October 4, 2018 3 Objections to #2 Order and Request for Article III Judge filed by David Webb. (kh, )
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDERED that on or before October 15, 2018 Webb shall file an amended 28 U.S.C. 2241 petition in which he (i) identifies the proceeding wherein the United States failed to meet its burden of proof, (ii) specifically describes how this proceeding resulted in his unlawful detention, (iii) sets forth the date of his judgment of conviction by the trial court, (iv) advises whether he appealed this judgment, and (v) states whether he filed a 28 U.S.C. 2255 motion with the trial court challenging his conviction and, if so, the outcome of such motion. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/28/2018. (kh, )
September 27, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 4602050831.), filed by David Webb. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(beh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?