Gilley v. Windom et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Dale William Gilley and Dale William Gilley, Jr.
Defendant: Elizabeth Kellum, William Cole, Chris McCool, Richard J. Minor, Mary B. Windom and Beth Slate Poe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00503
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON MOTION granting #10 Motion to Inquire to the extent allowed by the order. Plaintiff is advised the court received the initial partial filing fee on 8/27/2019. Doc. #9 . Plaintiff is further advised this matter is before the court for screening under 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B), and he is currently under no order to submit additional filings at this time. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/4/2019. (cnw, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Inquire by Dale William Gilley, Jr. (kr, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 Initial partial Filing fee Received: $ 7.15, receipt number 4602054708. (cnw, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON MOTION granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension from 8/29/2019, to and including 9/5/2019, to comply with the court's 7/30/2019, order that he submit an initial partial filing fee to the court in the amount of $7.15; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish a copy of this order to the account clerk at the Staton Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/27/2019. (copy mailed to SCF as directed) (cnw, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 (Motion to Inform) MOTION for Extension of Time re #6 Order on Motion by Dale William Gilley, Jr. (cnw, )
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON MOTION: it is ORDERED that: 1) Plf's #5 Motion for Extension of Time, is GRANTED; 2) Plf is GRANTED an extension from 8/15/2019, to and including 8/29/2019, to comply with the court's 7/30/2019, order that he submit an initial partial filing fee to the court in the amount of $7.15; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish a copy of this order to the account clerk at the Staton Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/7/2019. (copy mailed to Staton CF account clerk as directed) (cnw, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time re #4 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, by Dale William Gilley, Jr. (cnw, )
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION granting #3 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $7.15 be paid on or before 8/15/2019, as further set out in order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at the Staton Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/30/2019. (furn: cashier) (cnw, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Dale William Gilley, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement)(cnw, )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 8/5/2019, Plf shall file either the $400.00 filing/administrative fees or an affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by relevant financial information from the inmate account clerk, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the CLERK to furnish him with a copy of the form affidavit used by persons seeking to proceed in forma pauperis before this court, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/22/2019. (IFP form mailed as directed)(cnw, )
July 16, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dale William Gilley. (No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (es, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against William Cole, Elizabeth Kellum, Chris McCool, Richard J. Minor, Beth Slate Poe, Mary B. Windom, filed by Dale William Gilley. (NO IFP; NO FILING FEE). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilley v. Windom et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Kellum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris McCool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary B. Windom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Slate Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale William Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale William Gilley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?