Pate v. Woods (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Frank Edwin Pate
Defendant: Walter Woods and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00580
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 (Memorandum in Support of PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 USC 2241) MEMORANDUM in Support re: #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Frank Edwin Pate. (cnw, )
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTION: Petitioner's "Motion for Relief," which the court construes as a Motion for Order to Show Cause (Doc. #6 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/30/2019. (cnw, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 (Motion for Relief) MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Frank Edwin Pate. (cnw, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Response to Order re #3 Order, by Frank Edwin Pate. (wcl, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 (Jurisdictional Question) NOTICE by Frank Edwin Pate. (cnw, )
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing (1) This petition be construed as a motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255; (2) The United States of America shall henceforth be listed as the sole respondent; (3) on or before 8/30/2019, Pate shall inform the court if he wishes to do one of the following: (a) Continue to proceed only on the claims he presents in the construed 2255 motion; or (b) Amend the construed 2255 motion to assert any additional claims he wishes to assert under 2255 in challenging his conviction and sentence; or (c) Withdraw the construed 2255 motion and dismiss this action, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/16/19. (djy, )
August 13, 2019 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Frank Edwin Pate (No PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #2 ).(djy, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 (CONSTRUED as a 2255 Motion pursuant to #3 order) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Frank Edwin Pate. (NO Filing Fee, NO IFP) (wcl, ) Modified on 8/16/2019 (djy, ).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Copy of ORDER, entered in 2:19-CV-574-MHT, directing the clerk to open a separate civil action for each inmate listed as a petitioner in this case and place a copy of the "Application of Habeas Corpus" in each newly opened case. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/13/2019. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pate v. Woods (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Edwin Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?