Black v. Marshall (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Michael Eugene Black
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Case Number: 2:2019cv00616
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINAL JUDGMENT: in accordance with the order entered on this date adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the Court that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice; DIRECTING the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, )
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION and ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED, the Plf's #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED, and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for the Plf's failure to pay the filing and administrative fees upon the initiation of this case. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/10/2019. (wcl, )
October 10, 2019 No objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) Plf's #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED; and 2) This case be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plf's failure to pay the filing and administrative fees upon his initiation of this case; Objections to R&R due by 9/13/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/30/2019. (wcl, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Michael Eugene Black. (bes, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Steven T. Marshall, filed by Michael Eugene Black.(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Marshall (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Eugene Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?