King et al v. The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald A. King and The Dustin Inman Society, Inc.
Defendant: The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00120
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 - 1 Complaint & #3 Amended Complaint. (amf, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Donald A. King, The Dustin Inman Society, Inc.. (McKoon, James) Modified on 4/14/2020 to add link to #4 Deficiency notice (cnw, ).
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Donald A. King & The Dustin Inman Society, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cnw, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc., filed by Donald A. King, The Dustin Inman Society, Inc.(McKoon, James) Modified on 4/13/2020 to remove "all defs" and list defs name (cnw, ).
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. (cnw, )
February 20, 2020 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
February 20, 2020 COMPLAINT against The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc., filed by Donald A. King, The Dustin Inman Society, Inc. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cnw, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 03-cv-2020-900271. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056875) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 receipt) (cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A. King
Represented By: James Robert McKoon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Dustin Inman Society, Inc.
Represented By: James Robert McKoon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Southern Poverty Law Center, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Woodforde Maxymuk
Represented By: Shannon Lynn Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?