Jones v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Quincy B. Jones
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall, Herman Quay and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00324
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTION (Seller's Claim) to #6 Report and Recommendations by Quincy B. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Supporting documents)(am, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that Jones's #1 2255 motion be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction because he has not received permission from the appellate court to file a successive 2255 motion; Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/21/2020. (am, )
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: DIRECTING the Clerk to modify the docket to reflect that Petitioner's #1 pleading is a 2255 motion and that this civil action is proceeding under 28 U.S.C. 2255. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/21/2020. (am, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION: DENYING as moot Petitioner's #2 motion to proceed without prepayment of fees. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/20/2020. (am, )
May 14, 2020 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Quincy B. Jones, as construed in the Court's #5 Order. (NO PDF - See doc #1 )(am, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Quincy B. Jones. (imm, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 (CONSTRUED AS A 2255 MOTION PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #5 ORDER) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Quincy B. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(imm, ) Modified on 5/21/2020 (am, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincy B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?