Jones v. Bolling et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Dontavius Devon Jones
Defendant: Leon Bolling, Steven T. Marshall and Karla Walker Jones
Case Number: 2:2020cv00540
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: it is ORDERED that on or before 10/5/2020, Petitioner shall show cause why his 2254 petition should not be dismissed because it was not filed within the one-year limitation period in 28 U.S.C. 2244(d) and for the other reasons asserted by Respondents in their answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/14/2020. (cwl, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Leon Bolling, Steven T. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - vol 1 - record on direct appeal CR-15-0259, #2 Exhibit 1 - vol 2 - record on direct appeal CR-15-0259, #3 Exhibit 1 - vol 3 - record on direct appeal CR-15-0259, #4 Exhibit 2 - first supplemental record on direct appeal CR-15-0259, #5 Exhibit 3 - second supplemental record on appeal CR-15-0259, #6 Exhibit 4 - brief filed by Petitioner in CR-15-0259, #7 Exhibit 5 - brief filed by the State in CR-15-0259, #8 Exhibit 6 - Alabama Court of Criminal Appeal's September 2, 2016 memorandum opinion, #9 Exhibit 7 - Certificate of judgment in CR-15-0259, #10 Exhibit 8 - Jones's motion in the Alabama Court of Criminal Appeals seeking leave to file an out-of-time application for rehearing, #11 Exhibit 9 - Alabama Court of Criminal Appeals letter to Jones returning unfiled his motion, #12 Exhibit 10 - Jones's motion in the Alabama Supreme Court seeking leave to file an out-of-time petition for writ of certiorari, #13 Exhibit 11 - Alabama Supreme Court's order denying Jones's motion)(Dodd, Stephen)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Correction re #7 Notice of Appearance, to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the Defendant's name in the style of the case. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main Document Entry #7 )(cwl, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Leon Bolling, Steven T. Marshall. (Dodd, Stephen)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Norwood Dodd on behalf of Leon Bolling, Steven T. Marshall (Dodd, Stephen) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/26/2020 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the Defendant's name in the style of the case) (cwl, ). Modified on 8/26/2020 (cwl, ).
August 26, 2020 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Leon Bolling, Steven T. Marshall. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition & #5 Order signed by Sandra Blackmon for Steven T. Marshall served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (cwl, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER on or before 9/10/2020; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Leon Bolling & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/18/2020. (cwl, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION: The petitioner's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this habeas corpus action (Doc. #3 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/18/2020. (cwl, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Dontavius Devon Jones. (cwl, )
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 8/17/2020, Petitioner shall either submit the $5.00 filing fee or file the appropriate affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to SEND Petitioner a form for use in filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/3/2020. (form mailed as directed) (cwl, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Dontavius Devon Jones. (No IFP/No Filing Fee). (imm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Bolling et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Bolling
Represented By: Stephen Norwood Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Represented By: Stephen Norwood Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Walker Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontavius Devon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?