Serratt v. Butler et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Bobby Gene Smith, Jr., Jonathan Yancy, Roy Murphy Rutledge, Brian Lee Flowers, Kevon Darrell Mims, Randy Lee Crocker, Stanford Earl Pritchett, George Campbell, David Adam Laney, Clifford Barbee, James Earl Caine, Joseph Brent Long, Jonathan Louis LaPointe, Timothy Lee Starr, William Chris Nelms, William Jacob Jackson, John Owen Walsh, Jr., Maverick Allen Taylor, Steven Ronald Blackwell, Wendell Larand Crawford, Tony Larue Dent, Jacob Dylan Barefield, Kenneth R. Berry, Michael Ethan Ramos, Darrel Eugenn O'Bannon, Bruce Anthony Newburn, Jerry Wayne Scofield, James Edward Holland, Ronald Joe Hall, Arthur David Adams, Charles Edward Lucas, James B. Skiles, D'Athony Lee Brown, Christopher Allan Elkins, Jeremy Deon Alexander, Larry Ray Johnson, Jr., Gregory Levon Williams, Girlis Hugh Serratt, David Wesley Campbell, Martin Lamar Caldwell, William Wayne Crooms, Michael Scott Moss, Eric Matthew Blackerby, Elijah Martin, Samuel P. Wadsworth, Richard Minard Clark, Christopher Terell Dull, Larry Cotton, James Bradford Skiles, George Campbell, III and Jonathan Yancey
Defendant: Warden Butler, Kay Ivey, Jefferson S. Dunn, John Crow, Celeste Hunter, Sherry Price and Reosha Butler
Case Number: 2:2020cv00625
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 26 Return Receipt Card showing service of #9 Order to Show Cause, signed by (No Signature, Green Card torn) for Wexford Health Sources, Inc., served on 9/28/2020 (per USPS website).(amf, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 25 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Celeste Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Piggott, Philip)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time; further ORDERED that the defendants are GRANTED an extension from 10/15/2020 to and including 11/18/2020 to file their response to the plaintiff's #7 motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/15/2020. (amf, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time; further ORDERED that the defendants are GRANTED an extension from 11/3/2020 to and including 12/14/2020 to file their special report and answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/15/2020. (amf, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time for Response to Preliminary Injunction Request re #9 Order by Reosha Butler, John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Sherry Price. (Harmon, Bart)
October 14, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer re #8 Order by Reosha Butler, John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Sherry Price. (Harmon, Bart)
October 14, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Reosha Butler, John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Sherry Price. (Harmon, Bart)
October 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Bart Gregory Harmon on behalf of Reosha Butler, John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Sherry Price (Harmon, Bart)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Celeste Hunter re #17 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Piggott, Philip)
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Celeste Hunter; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
October 14, 2020 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Defendant Celeste Hunter. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
October 14, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #19 NOTICE - Attorney Carrie Ellis McCollum for Defendants Reosha Butler, John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, & Sherry Price added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
October 13, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #16 RESPONSE - Attorney Philip Piggott for Defendant Celeste Hunter added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and RESPONSE to Order re #9 Order by Celeste Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1)(Piggott, Philip) Modified on 10/14/2020 to clarify the docket text and add the link to the #7 motion (amf, ).
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of #7 Amended Inmate 1983 Complaint, #8 Order, & #9 Order to Chow Cause, signed by E. Howard for Celeste Hunter, served on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (amf, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of #7 amended complaint and order of procedure signed by (no signature) for Reosha Butler served on (no date given), answer due 11/3/2020. (djy, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of #9 Order to Show Cause, signed by Kristi Simpson for ALDOC General Counsel, served on 9/25/2020. (amf, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of #7 Amended Inmate 1983 Complaint, #8 Order, & #9 Order to Show Cause, signed by Barbara Baldwin for Sherry Price, served on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (amf, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of #7 Amended Inmate 1983 Complaint, #8 Order, & #9 Order to Show Cause, signed by Barbara Baldwin for Jefferson S. Dunn, served on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (amf, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of #7 Amended Inmate 1983 Complaint, #8 Order, & #9 Order to Show Cause, signed by Sharon Blakely for John Crow, served on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (amf, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing that on or before 10/15/2020 the defs shall file a response to the #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, as further set out in order; directing the clerk to provide a copy of this order via certified mail to the individual defendants, General Counsel for the Alabama Department of Corrections and Counsel for Wexford Health Sources, Inc. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/23/2020. (djy, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT on or before 11/3/2020, as further set out in order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with amended complaint to named defendants; mailed with amended complaint to Gen Counsel for ADOC and Counsel for Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/23/2020. (djy, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Reosha Butler, John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Celeste Hunter, Sherry Price, filed by Girlis Hugh Serratt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(amf, )
September 22, 2020 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Girlis Hugh Serratt. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #7 for PDF) (amf, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing that on or before 9/16/2020 plf shall file an amended complaint, as further set out in order; directing the clerk to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file 1983 complaints, and Plaintiff shall use this form in filing his amended complaint. The court will consider only those claims set forth and defendants named in the amended complaint. As such, the amended complaint will supersede the original complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/1/2020. Mailed with 1983 complaint form to plf, as directed.(djy, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until $350 fee is paid in full, as further set out in order; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Ventress Corr Fac. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/1/2020. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing that this case proceed with Girlis Hugh Serratt as the sole plf; directing the clerk to: (1) Open a separate civil action for each of the other inmates who signed the complaint; (2) Strike the in forma pauperis applications filed by all inmates other than inmate Girlis Hugh Serratt from the file in this case; (3) Place a copy of the complaint and the particular in forma pauperis application filed by the inmate whose name in which the new case is opened in the newly opened case; (4) assign each newly opened case to a District Judge and Magistrate Judge in the normal docketing process. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/1/2020. (djy, ) .
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 (STRICKEN pursuant to #4 order) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Arthur David Adams, Jeremy Deon Alexander, Clifford Barbee, Jacob Dylan Barefield, Kenneth R. Berry, Eric Matthew Blackerby, Steven Ronald Blackwell, D'Athony Lee Brown, James Earl Caine, Martin Lamar Caldwell, David Wesley Campbell, George Campbell, Richard Minard Clark, Larry Cotton, Wendell Larand Crawford, Randy Lee Crocker, William Wayne Crooms, Tony Larue Dent, Christopher Terell Dull, Christopher Allan Elkins, Brian Lee Flowers, Ronald Joe Hall, James Edward Holland, William Jacob Jackson, Larry Ray Johnson, Jr, Jonathan Louis LaPointe, David Adam Laney, Joseph Brent Long, Charles Edward Lucas, Elijah Martin, Kevon Darrell Mims, Michael Scott Moss, William Chris Nelms, Bruce Anthony Newburn, Darrel Eugenn O'Bannon, Stanford Earl Pritchett, Michael Ethan Ramos, Roy Murphy Rutledge, Jerry Wayne Scofield, James B. Skiles, Bobby Gene Smith, Jr, Timothy Lee Starr, Maverick Allen Taylor, Samuel P. Wadsworth, John Owen Walsh, Jr, Gregory Levon Williams, Jonathan Yancy. (es, ) Modified on 9/1/2020 (djy, ).
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Girlis Hugh Serratt. (es, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Reosha Butler, Jefferson S. Dunn, Kay Ivey, filed by James B. Skiles, Christopher Allan Elkins, Michael Scott Moss, William Chris Nelms, Roy Murphy Rutledge, Timothy Lee Starr, Girlis Hugh Serratt, William Jacob Jackson, Larry Ray Johnson, Jr, David Adam Laney, Brian Lee Flowers, James Earl Caine, Bruce Anthony Newburn, Eric Matthew Blackerby, John Owen Walsh, Jr, Randy Lee Crocker, Maverick Allen Taylor, David Wesley Campbell, Joseph Brent Long, Bobby Gene Smith, Jr, Richard Minard Clark, Charles Edward Lucas, Jacob Dylan Barefield, George Campbell, Christopher Terell Dull, Clifford Barbee, Jerry Wayne Scofield, Kenneth R. Berry, Samuel P. Wadsworth, Michael Ethan Ramos, Ronald Joe Hall, Elijah Martin, Larry Cotton, Jonathan Louis LaPointe, Arthur David Adams, James Edward Holland, Gregory Levon Williams, Tony Larue Dent, Wendell Larand Crawford, William Wayne Crooms, Jonathan Yancy, Darrel Eugenn O'Bannon, Jeremy Deon Alexander, Steven Ronald Blackwell, D'Athony Lee Brown, Martin Lamar Caldwell, Kevon Darrell Mims, Stanford Earl Pritchett. (Attachments: #1 Appendix E, #2 Appendix F)(es, )
August 27, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Arthur David Adams, Jeremy Deon Alexander, Clifford Barbee, Jacob Dylan Barefield, Kenneth R. Berry, Eric Matthew Blackerby, Steven Ronald Blackwell, D'Athony Lee Brown, James Earl Caine, Martin Lamar Caldwell, David Wesley Campbell, George Campbell, Richard Minard Clark, Larry Cotton, Wendell Larand Crawford, Randy Lee Crocker, William Wayne Crooms, Tony Larue Dent, Christopher Terell Dull, Christopher Allan Elkins, Brian Lee Flowers, Ronald Joe Hall, James Edward Holland, William Jacob Jackson, Larry Ray Johnson, Jr, Jonathan Louis LaPointe, David Adam Laney, Joseph Brent Long, Charles Edward Lucas, Elijah Martin, Kevon Darrell Mims, Michael Scott Moss, William Chris Nelms, Bruce Anthony Newburn, Darrel Eugenn O'Bannon, Stanford Earl Pritchett, Michael Ethan Ramos, Roy Murphy Rutledge, Jerry Wayne Scofield, Girlis Hugh Serratt, James B. Skiles, Bobby Gene Smith, Jr, Timothy Lee Starr, Maverick Allen Taylor, Samuel P. Wadsworth, John Owen Walsh, Jr, Gregory Levon Williams, Jonathan Yancy. (No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (es, )
August 27, 2020 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Arthur David Adams, Jeremy Deon Alexander, Clifford Barbee, Jacob Dylan Barefield, Kenneth R. Berry, Eric Matthew Blackerby, Steven Ronald Blackwell, D'Athony Lee Brown, James Earl Caine, Martin Lamar Caldwell, David Wesley Campbell, George Campbell, Richard Minard Clark, Larry Cotton, Wendell Larand Crawford, Randy Lee Crocker, William Wayne Crooms, Tony Larue Dent, Christopher Terell Dull, Christopher Allan Elkins, Brian Lee Flowers, Ronald Joe Hall, James Edward Holland, William Jacob Jackson, Larry Ray Johnson, Jr, Jonathan Louis LaPointe, David Adam Laney, Joseph Brent Long, Charles Edward Lucas, Elijah Martin, Kevon Darrell Mims, Michael Scott Moss, William Chris Nelms, Bruce Anthony Newburn, Darrel Eugenn O'Bannon, Stanford Earl Pritchett, Michael Ethan Ramos, Roy Murphy Rutledge, Jerry Wayne Scofield, Girlis Hugh Serratt, James B. Skiles, Bobby Gene Smith, Jr, Timothy Lee Starr, Maverick Allen Taylor, Samuel P. Wadsworth, John Owen Walsh, Jr, Gregory Levon Williams, Jonathan Yancy. (No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serratt v. Butler et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Gene Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Yancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Murphy Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lee Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevon Darrell Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Lee Crocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Earl Pritchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Adam Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Barbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Earl Caine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Brent Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Louis LaPointe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Lee Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Chris Nelms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jacob Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Owen Walsh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maverick Allen Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ronald Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Larand Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Larue Dent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Dylan Barefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ethan Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel Eugenn O'Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Anthony Newburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Wayne Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Joe Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur David Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Athony Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Allan Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Deon Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Ray Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Levon Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Girlis Hugh Serratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wesley Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Lamar Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wayne Crooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scott Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Matthew Blackerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel P. Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Minard Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Terell Dull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bradford Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Campbell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crow
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celeste Hunter
Represented By: Philip Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Price
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reosha Butler
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?