Hood et al v. Veazey et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Rothlander and Mendy Hood
Defendant: Mt. Hebron West Baptist Church, Crossroads Community Church, a Southern Baptist Fellowship, The State Board of Missions of The Alabama Baptist State Convention, Elmore Baptist Association, Inc., Stephen King, Jane Barrett, Terry Mullins and Jimmy L. Veazey
Case Number: 2:2020cv00712
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to #14 motion to dismiss by Mendy Hood. (Norris, John) Modified on 10/26/2020 to correct motion event & clarify text as reflected in pleading (am, ).
October 23, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument filed by Mendy Hood. (Norris, John) Modified on 10/26/2020 to clarify text as reflected in pleading(am, ).
October 7, 2020 Filing 23 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to The State Board of Missions of The Alabama Baptist State Convention with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (bes, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 22 AMENDED Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mt. Hebron West Baptist Church. (Wolter, Daniel) Modified on 10/6/2020 to reflect as Amended(am, ).
October 5, 2020 Filing 21 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Stephen King re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Wolter, Daniel)
October 5, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Terry Mullins re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Wolter, Daniel)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mt. Hebron West Baptist Church re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Wolter, Daniel)
October 5, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Elmore Baptist Association, Inc. re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Wolter, Daniel)
October 5, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jane Barrett re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Wolter, Daniel)
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jane Barrett, Stephen King, Terry Mullins, Elmore Baptist Association, Inc., & Mt. Hebron West Baptist Church; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Jane Barrett, Elmore Baptist Association, Inc., Stephen King, Mt. Hebron West Baptist Church, Terry Mullins. (am, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Elmore Baptist Association, Inc., Jane Barrett, Terry Mullins, Mt. Hebron West Baptist Church, Stephen King. (Wolter, Daniel)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Jimmy Veazey for Jimmy L. Veazey served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (am, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by illegible for Stephen King served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (bes, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicole Rothlander, Mendy Hood. The State Board of Missions of The Alabama Baptist State Convention waiver sent on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Norris, John)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Sandra Culverhouse for Jane Barrett served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (am, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Ray McKenzie for Elmore Baptist Association, Inc. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (am, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Sandra Culverhouse for Mt. Hebron West Baptist Church served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (am, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Terry Mullins with the following USPS notation, " Return to Sender - Unable to Forward; Counsel is notified via this notice of un-perfected service." (am, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Nicole Rothlander re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Norris, John) Modified on 9/15/2020 to remove the link to the #5 Disclosure Statement and to add the link to the #3 Notice (bes, ).
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mendy Hood re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Norris, John)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jane Barrett, Elmore Baptist Association, Inc., Stephen King, Mt. Hebron West Baptist Church, Terry Mullins, The State Board of Missions of The Alabama Baptist State Convention, Jimmy L. Veazey; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Mendy Hood & Nicole Rothlander; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Mendy Hood, Nicole Rothlander. (am, )
September 4, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mendy Hood, Nicole Rothlander. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Barrett, Elmore Baptist Association, Inc., Stephen King, Mt. Hebron West Baptist Church, Terry Mullins, The State Board of Missions of The Alabama Baptist State Convention & Jimmy L. Veazey, filed by Nicole Rothlander, Mendy Hood.(Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602059357.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(am, ) Modified on 9/15/2020 to add other defendant (am, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hood et al v. Veazey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Hebron West Baptist Church
Represented By: Daniel Serenus Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Community Church, a Southern Baptist Fellowship
Represented By: Daniel Serenus Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State Board of Missions of The Alabama Baptist State Convention
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmore Baptist Association, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Serenus Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen King
Represented By: Daniel Serenus Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Barrett
Represented By: Daniel Serenus Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Mullins
Represented By: Daniel Serenus Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy L. Veazey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Rothlander
Represented By: John David Norris
Represented By: Lee Ann Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mendy Hood
Represented By: John David Norris
Represented By: Lee Ann Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?