Barefield v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Barefield
Defendant: Arnaldo Mercado, Kay Ivey, Jacob R. Peters, Patricia Myers, Karla Jones, Jeffery A. Williams, Dennis Stamper, D'Anthony V. Byrd, Steve N. Watson, Brian S. Gordon, Robert E. Lewis, III, Christopher Gordy, Christina S. Glenn, Christy Vincent, General Counsel Anne Hill, Jennifer S. Abbott, Grantt Culliver, Ruth Naglich, Josiah C. Haggins, Michael Strickland, Matthew C. Brand, Jefferson S. Dunn and Lizzie Rumph
Case Number: 2:2020cv00917
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
2 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Christopher Gordy by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Attempted Not Known, Unable to Forward, Refused, Postage paid to Return to Sender." Handwritten note, "This was meant to be sent to Christopher Gordy as the Warden of Ventress who is not at Staton. I am Christopher Gordy his son employed at Easterling." Counsel notified by this docket entry. (dmn, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Admission of Non-Resident Attorneys: Luke P. van Houwelingen, Charlotte Gillingham, Alexis V. DeBernardis, and Eric S. Fanchiang Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/23/2020. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Pro Hac Filing fee re: #21 Motion for Admission of Luke P. van Houwelingen $75.00, receipt number 4602060643. (am, )
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Pro Hac Filing fee re: #21 Motion for Admission of Eric S. Fanchiang $75.00, receipt number 4602060646. (am, )
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Pro Hac Filing fee re: #21 Motion for Admission of Charlotte Gillingham $75.00, receipt number 4602060644. (am, )
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Pro Hac Filing fee re: #21 Motion for Admission of Alexis V. DeBernardis: $75.00, receipt number 4602060645. (am, )
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Motion for Admission of Non-Resident Attorneys: Luke P. van Houwelingen, Charlotte Gillingham, Alexis V. DeBernardis, and Eric S. Fanchiang Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Barefield. (Maxymuk, Benjamin) Modified on 12/14/2020 to add PHV Attorney names (am, ).
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: It is ORDERED that Defendants' #15 motion for extension of time is GRANTED and that the deadline for these Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED to and including 1/15/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/9/2020. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USPS as to Robert E. Lewis, III with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward." Counsel notified electronically by this docket entry. (dmn, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USPS as to Lizzie Rumph with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward." Counsel notified electronically by this docket entry.(dmn, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USPS as to Josiah C. Haggins with the following notation, Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. Counsel notified electronically by this docket entry.(dmn, ) Modified on 12/8/2020 to remove no pdf text added erroneously. (dmn, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USPS as to Brian S. Gordon with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward." Counsel notified electronically by this docket entry. (dmn, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Attorney Matthew Reeves and LaKeisha W Butler added for Jennifer S. Abbott, Matthew C. Brand, Grantt Culliver, for Jefferson S. Dunn, Christina S. Glenn, Christopher Gordy, Anne Hill, Kay Ivey, Karla Jones, Arnaldo Mercado, Patricia Myers, Ruth Naglich, Jacob R. Peters, Dennis Stamper, Michael Strickland, Steve N. Watson, Jeffery A. Williams. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #15 for pdf)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time #1 Complaint by Jennifer S. Abbott, Matthew C. Brand, Grantt Culliver, Jefferson S. Dunn, Christina S. Glenn, Christopher Gordy, Anne Hill, Kay Ivey, Karla Jones, Arnaldo Mercado, Patricia Myers, Ruth Naglich, Jacob R. Peters, Dennis Stamper, Michael Strickland, Steve N. Watson, Jeffery A. Williams. (Lunsford, William) Modified on 12/9/2020 to correct event(am, ).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, #2 Disclosure Statement signed by J Peters for Jacob R. Peters served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020. (am, )
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, #2 Disclosure Statement signed by Barbara Baldwin for Michael Strickland served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (am, )
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Karla Jones re: #10 Return of Service with the following USPS notation, "Return to Sender - Refused - Unable to Forward;" Counsel is notified via this notice regarding un-perfected service. (am, ) Modified on 11/20/2020 to add linkage (am, ).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, #2 Disclosure Statement signed by Barbara Baldwin for Jennifer S. Abbott served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020; Matthew C. Brand served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020; Jefferson S. Dunn served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020; Anne Hill served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020; Arnaldo Mercado served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020; Ruth Naglich served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020; Dennis Stamper served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020; Steve N. Watson served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020; Jeffery A. Williams served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020; signed by Tom Chesnutt for Kay Ivey served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (am, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, #2 Disclosure Statement signed by illegible for Karla Jones served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (am, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, #2 Disclosure Statement signed by CV-19 for Christopher Gordy served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (am, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, #2 Disclosure Statement signed by illegible for Patricia Myers served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (am, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, #2 Disclosure Statement signed by E. Howard for D'Anthony V. Byrd served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (am, )
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, #2 Disclosure Statement signed by Christina Glenn for Christina S. Glenn served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (am, )
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by G. Gulliver for Grantt Culliver served on 11/14/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (am, )
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jennifer S. Abbott, Matthew C. Brand, D'Anthony V. Byrd, Grantt Culliver, Jefferson S. Dunn, Christina S. Glenn, Brian S. Gordon, Christopher Gordy, Josiah C. Haggins, Anne Hill, Kay Ivey, Karla Jones, Robert E. Lewis, III, Arnaldo Mercado, Patricia Myers, Ruth Naglich, Jacob R. Peters, Lizzie Rumph, Dennis Stamper, Michael Strickland, Christy Vincent, Steve N. Watson, Jeffery A. Williams and mailed CMRRR #1 Complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement. (kh, )
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Chief Judge Emily C. Marks no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jacob Barefield. (kh, )
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennifer S. Abbott, Matthew C. Brand, D'Anthony V. Byrd, Grantt Culliver, Jefferson S. Dunn, Christina S. Glenn, Brian S. Gordon, Christopher Gordy, Josiah C. Haggins, Anne Hill, Kay Ivey, Karla Jones, Robert E. Lewis, III, Arnaldo Mercado, Patricia Myers, Ruth Naglich, Jacob R. Peters, Lizzie Rumph, Dennis Stamper, Michael Strickland, Christy Vincent, Steve N. Watson, Jeffery A. Williams ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602060140.), filed by Jacob Barefield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jacob Barefield. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barefield v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnaldo Mercado
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob R. Peters
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Myers
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Jones
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery A. Williams
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Stamper
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'Anthony V. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve N. Watson
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian S. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Lewis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Gordy
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina S. Glenn
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Counsel Anne Hill
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer S. Abbott
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grantt Culliver
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Naglich
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josiah C. Haggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Strickland
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew C. Brand
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Represented By: William Richard Lunsford
Represented By: Matthew Reeves
Represented By: LaKeisha W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lizzie Rumph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Barefield
Represented By: Charlotte Gillingham
Represented By: Benjamin Woodforde Maxymuk
Represented By: Jeane A. Thomas
Represented By: Leland P Frost
Represented By: Alexis DeBemardis
Represented By: Luke van Houwelingen
Represented By: Eric Fanchiang
Represented By: Alexis DeBernardis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?