Lindberg v. Cohen et al
Plaintiff: Greg E. Lindberg
Defendant: Michael Carvajal and Alan Cohen
Case Number: 2:2021cv00415
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons #1 Petition, #6 Motion, #7 Brief, and #9 Order signed by D. Hill on 6/27/2021. (djy, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT, Pursuant to the #23 joint stipulation of dismissal, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this cause is dismissed in its entirety without prejudice and with each party to bear his own costs; all pending motions are denied as moot, and the #18 recommendation is withdrawn; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(ii) by Greg E. Lindberg. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greene, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/28/2021 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of defendants (qc/djy, ).
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order STIPULATION of Dismissal by Michael Carvajal, Alan Cohen, Greg E. Lindberg. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-see docket entry #23 ). (djy, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Michael Carvajal, Alan Cohen re #21 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Wadsworth, Stephen) Modified on 7/8/2021 to add the link to the #21 Notice (amf, ).
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendants Alan Cohen & Michael Carvajal; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
June 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION AND ORDER: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The United States Magistrate Judge's #18 recommendation is adopted to the extent that petitioner-plaintiff Greg E. Lindberg seeks emergency-habeas and alternative preliminary-injunctive relief from the court before 6/21/2021; (2) The #1 petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied to the extent that petitioner-plaintiff Lindberg seeks emergency-habeas relief from the court before 6/21/2021; (3) The #1 motion for preliminary injunction is denied to the extent petitioner-plaintiff Lindberg seeks preliminary-injunctive relief from the court before 6/21/2021; 4) As to the final submission of the magistrate judge's #18 recommendation; the final submission of petitioner-plaintiff Lindberg's #1 petition for writ of habeas corpus to the extent he seeks emergency-habeas relief; and the final submission of petitioner-plaintiff Lindberg's #1 motion for preliminary injunction, petitioner-plaintiff Lindberg still has until 6/28/2021, to file objections, as allowed by the magistrate judge; This case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, )
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, to the extent petitioner Greg E. Lindberg seeks emergency or preliminary injunctive relief from the court before 6/21/2021, he shall file any objections to the report and recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge by 5:00 p.m. today. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/18/2021. (wcl, )
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: the undersigned RECOMMENDS that his #1 petition for writ of habeas corpus and motion for preliminary injunction be DENIED; Objections to R&R due by 6/28/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/18/2021. (wcl, )
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ***PURSUANT TO THE #17 RESPONSE - Attorney Stephen D Wadsworth for Michael Carvajal and Alan Cohen added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency Habeas Relief filed by Michael Carvajal, Alan Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email from Greg E. Lindberg to Ms. Taylor, #2 Exhibit Email from Greg E. Lindberg to Warden Cohen, #3 Exhibit Brief in Support of North Carolina Motion, #4 Exhibit Order Denying Relief in North Carolina)(Wadsworth, Stephen)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency Habeas Relief filed by Michael Carvajal, Alan Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email from Greg E. Lindberg to Ms. Taylor, #2 Exhibit Email from Greg E. Lindberg to Warden Cohen, #3 Exhibit Brief in Support of North Carolina Motion, #4 Exhibit Order Denying Relief in North Carolina)(Wadsworth, Stephen)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by the USMS; US Attorney's Office served on 6/16/2021 and Alan Cohen served on 6/16/2021; answer due 6/17/2021. (wcl, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on Alan Cohen on 6/16/2021 as to #11 Summons, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency Habeas Relief, #7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, and #9 Order. (wcl, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on US Attorney's Office on 6/16/2021 as to #11 Summons, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency Habeas Relief, #7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, and #9 Order. (wcl, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency Habeas Relief. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/16/2021. (wcl, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Alan Cohen and U.S. Attorney; USM 285 form and copies of #1 Petition, #6 Motion, #7 Brief, and #9 Order delivered to USMS for service. (wcl, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Michael Carvajal and and U.S. Attorney General; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Petition, #6 Motion, #7 Brief, and #9 Order. (wcl, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition no later than 6/17/2021, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to prepare the forms necessary to serve all interested parties in this case; further DIRECTING the Clerk to issue the appropriate summons in this case, including a copy of this order, a copy of the #1 Petition, #6 renewed motion for temporary restraining order and motion for emergency relief, and #7 brief in support, to Director Michael Carvajal and the Attorney General by certified mail; DIRECTING the United States Marshall Service to serve the United States Attorney for the Middle District of Alabama and Warden Alan Cohen with the appropriate summons in this case, a copy of this order, a copy of the #1 Petition, #6 renewed motion for temporary restraining order and motion for emergency relief, and #7 brief in support, by no later than 6/16/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/16/2021. (furn: USMS) (wcl, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William Benjamin Reese; ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth Freeman Greene. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/16/2021. (wcl, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency Habeas Relief, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief filed by Greg E. Lindberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Facilitate Trial Testimony, #2 Exhibit Letter Sarah Allison, #3 Exhibit Letters of Support)(Greene, Elizabeth)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency Habeas Relief by Greg E. Lindberg. (Greene, Elizabeth)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636, this case is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/16/2021. (wcl, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/16/2021. (wcl, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth Freeman Greene (Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602063641.) by Greg E. Lindberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Receipt)(es, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William Benjamin Reese (Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602063641.) by Greg E. Lindberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Receipt)(es, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 4602063640.), filed by Greg E. Lindberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee)(es, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Greg E. Lindberg. (No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindberg v. Cohen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Carvajal
Represented By: Stephen D Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Cohen
Represented By: Stephen D Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg E. Lindberg
Represented By: Elizabeth Freeman Greene
Represented By: William Benjamin Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?