McConico v. Cook et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: James McConico, Jr.
Defendant: Mary Cook, Kay Ivey, Jefferson S. Dunn, Alabama Department of Corrections, Jimmy Pool, Gary Lee Willford, Jr., Captain Shafter and Monica McCoy
Case Number: 2:2022cv00145
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Order of the Court entered on this day adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Final Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff, and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cwl, )
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: the #15 Recommendation is ADOPTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Final Judgment will be entered separately. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/16/2022. (cwl, )
August 16, 2022 NO OBJECTIONS filed to the #15 Recommendation. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
July 27, 2022 Filing 15 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: the undersigned Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS this case be DISMISSED without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/27/2022. (am, )
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON MOTION: it is ORDERED that the #13 motion is GRANTED and the time for Plaintiff to either submit the $350 filing fee (if he is not seeking to proceed in forma pauperis) or an affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma paupers, is EXTENDED to 5/26/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/5/2022. (amf, )
May 5, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Provide Plaintiff Until May 26th, 2022 to Pay Filing Fee filed by James McConico, Jr.. (amf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2022: #1 Declaration) (amf, ). Modified on 5/5/2022 to attach the declaration which was erroneously omitted (amf, ).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER denying #11 Motion to Waive Filing Fee; The #11 motion may be reconsidered subject to Plaintiff's compliance with the #10 Order; further ORDERED that the time for Plaintiff to comply with the #10 Order that he file either the $402.00 filing and administrative fees or an affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by relevant financial information from the inmate account clerk, is EXTENDED to 5/5/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/21/2022. (amf, )
April 11, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Waive Filing Fee on the Basis Plaintiff is in Iminent Danger of Serious Physical Injury Due to Covid 19 Virus filed by James McConico, Jr.. (amf, )
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 4/11/2022, Plaintiff must file either the $402.00 filing and administrative fees or an affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by relevant financial information from the inmate account clerk; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish him with a copy of the form affidavit used by persons seeking to proceed in forma pauperis before this Court. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/28/2022. (IFP form mailed as directed) (Furnished: Cashier) (amf, )
March 25, 2022 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-00055. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 25, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED to the U.S. Magistrate Judge: #2 MOTION to Add Defendants. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plf's objections are OVERRULED. This action is transferred to the USDC, MDAL as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/24/22. (copy mailed to Plf on 3/25/22) (tot) [Transferred from alsd on 3/28/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Filing 7 Objection to #6 Report and Recommendation, filed by James McConico, Jr.; referred to Judge Moorer (mab) [Transferred from alsd on 3/28/2022.]
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending, in the interest of justice, that this action be transferred to the USDC, MDAL, as set out. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/15/22. (copy mailed to Plf on 2/15/22) (tot) [Transferred from alsd on 3/28/2022.]
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Referring all matters in this action to the Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 02/08/2022. (Copy to Plf on 02/09/22) (cjr) [Transferred from alsd on 3/28/2022.]
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The CLERK OF COURT is DIRECTED to open a new case on behalf of Plaintiff and transfer Documents 64 through 66 from civil case number 1:20-cv-00314-TFM-N to the new case along with a copy of this order as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 02/07/22. (Order originally entered in civil case number 1:20-cv-00314-TFM-N) (cjr) [Transferred from alsd on 3/28/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 EMERGENCY SECOND AMENDMENT to COMPLAINT filed by James McConico, Jr. (Referred to MJ Bivins (PSU) on 02/08/2022) (cjr) [Transferred from alsd on 3/28/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Add Defendants filed by James McConico, Jr. (Referred to MJ Bivins (PSU) on 02/08/22) (cjr) [Transferred from alsd on 3/28/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 INMATE 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Captain Shafter, Karen Carter, Mary Cook, Jefferson S. Dunn, Kay Ivey, Monica McCoy, Jimmy Pool, Cheryl Price, Gary Willford, filed by James McConico, Jr. (NO IFP; NO FILING FEE) (Referred to MJ Bivins (PSU) on 02/08/22) (cjr) [Transferred from alsd on 3/28/2022.] Modified on 3/28/2022 to add the "no ifp; no filing fee text" (amf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConico v. Cook et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McConico, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Pool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Lee Willford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Shafter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?