Zulu v. Ivey et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Muzuz Mussun Ali Bamu Zulu and Milton Dudley
Defendant: Kay Ivey, Karen Williams, Elizabeth Laseter, Captain Walker and Demetra L. Corcino
Case Number: 2:2023cv00695
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $21.67 be paid on or before 1/24/2024; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Fountain CF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/9/2024. (furn: cashier) (BES)
January 9, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE to the Court by Muzuz Mussun Ali Bamu Zulu (BES)
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Muzuz Mussun Ali Bamu Zulu. (BES)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plf's #10 motion for extension of time is GRANTED and that the deadline for Plf to submit his inmate account statement reflecting the average monthly balance in his inmate account and the average monthly deposits to his account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of his complaint is extended to 1/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 12/21/2023. (BES)
December 20, 2023 MOTION for Extension of Time by Muzuz Mussun Ali Bamu Zulu. (no PDF attached to this entry - see doc #10 for PDF) (BES)
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE to the Court by Muzuz Mussun Ali Bamu Zulu (bes, )
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 12/20/2023, Plaintiff must submit an inmate account statement from his place of incarceration reflecting the average monthly balance in his inmate account and the average monthly deposits to his account for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint, as further set out in Order; the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plaintiff is incarcerated, as further set out in the Order. (Furnished: KF, LW, and A/C at Fountain Correctional Facility). (Mailed USPS to Plaintiff). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 12/05/2023. (ggn, )
December 4, 2023 MOTION REFERRED: to US Magistrate Judge #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. (NO PDF attached). (ggn, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-01469. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (ggn, ).
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Having carefully reviewed and considered de novo all the materials in the court file, including the report and recommendation and objections thereto, the court ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's report and ACCEPTS his recommendation. Accordingly, the court ORDERS that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama for further proceedings. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 12/1/2023. (MEB2) [Transferred from alnd on 12/4/2023.]
November 13, 2023 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations by Muzuz Mussun Ali Bamu Zulu. (AKD) [Transferred from alnd on 12/4/2023.]
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Because Zulu dated his Notice of Address Change October 31, 2023, one day before the undersigned entered the aforementioned Report and Recommendation, the undersigned DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to re-serve the November 1, 2023, Report and Recommendation (Doc. #3 ), on Zulu at his new address. Zulu shall have 14 days from the entry date of this order to file objections to the report and recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/3/2023. (MEB2) [Transferred from alnd on 12/4/2023.]
November 2, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Muzuz Mussun Ali Bamu Zulu (RMM) [Transferred from alnd on 12/4/2023.]
November 1, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - For the reasons stated within, the undersigned RECOMMENDS this court TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The plaintiff may file specific written objections within 14 days. Objections to R&R due by 11/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/1/2023. (MEB2) [Transferred from alnd on 12/4/2023.]
October 27, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Muzuz Mussun Ali Bamu Zulu. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 12/4/2023.] Modified on 12/4/2023 (ggn, ).
October 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kay Ivey, Elizabeth Laseter, Walker, Karen Williams, filed by Muzuz Mussun Ali Bamu Zulu.(KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 12/4/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zulu v. Ivey et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muzuz Mussun Ali Bamu Zulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Laseter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demetra L. Corcino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?