Edwards v. Jones et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Demetrius M. Edwards
Defendant: Jay Jones, C. Torbert, C. Welch, T. Jones and Ofc. Spraggins
Case Number: 3:2009cv00660
Filed: July 15, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 11/18/09. (sl, )
November 13, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 12/4/09 plaintiff shall file a response to defendant's 28 written report as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 11/13/09. (sl, )
September 4, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that (1) the plaintiff's 7 objection to the Recommendation is overruled; (2) the 6 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; (3) plaintiff's claims against defendants J. Jones, C. Torbert, C. Welch, and T. Jones are dis missed without prejudice and prior to service of process; (4) defendants J. Jones, C. Torbert, C. Welch, and T. Jones are dismissed as parties to the complaint pursuant to 28 USC 1919(e)(2)(B); and (5) this case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 9/4/09. (sl, )
July 28, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) plaintiff's complaint against defendants J. Jones, C. Torbert, C. Welch, and T. Jones be dismissed without prejudice and prior to service of process; (2) defendants J. Jones, C. Torbert, C. Walch, and T. Jones be dismissed as parties to the complaint; and (3) this case with regard to the remaining defendant be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 7/28/09. (sl, )
July 17, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and Lee County Detention Center inmate account clerk. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 7/17/09. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Jones et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius M. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Torbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Spraggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?