Adetunji v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Linda M. Adetunji
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2011cv00157
Filed: March 7, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Macon
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: 1. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 17 is ADOPTED; 2. The decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED; and, 3. The action is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings. An appropriate final judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/10/2012. (jg, )
May 9, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the prior proceedings, opinions, and orders of the court, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the Commissioners decision is REVERSED and that the action is REMANDED to the Commissioner for furthe r proceedings. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/9/2012. (jg, ) Modified on 5/9/2012 to reflect that copies of order and recommendation were mailed to SSA Chief Judge and SSA (jg, ).
April 23, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED PURSUANT TO 15 ORDER; MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/23/2012. (jg, ) Modified on 4/23/2012 (jg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adetunji v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M. Adetunji
Represented By: Brian Roy Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?