Kelley v. U-Haul International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Eric Lee Kelley |
Defendant: |
U-Haul International, Inc., Sovran Holdings, Inc., Eberly Transportation, David Walker and Katherine Miller |
Cross_defendant: |
U-Haul International, Inc., David Walker, Sovran Holdings, Inc. and Eberly Transportation |
Cross_claimant: |
Katherine Miller |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv00919 |
Filed: |
October 24, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Opelika Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Terry F. Moorer |
Presiding Judge: |
Myron H. Thompson |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 4, 2012 |
Filing
94
ORDER directing that the 93 motion for extension of deadline is granted as requested. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/4/12. (scn, )
|
November 29, 2011 |
Filing
23
JUDGMENT granting 18 MOTION to Dismiss; dismissing David Walker, d/b/a Custom Trucks Unlimited, and the claims against him without prejudice; directing the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; terminating David Walker, d/b/a Custom Trucks Unlimited as a party. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/29/2011. (br, )
|
November 17, 2011 |
Filing
9
ORDER that the plaintiff has until November 28, 2011, to amend the complaint to allege jurisdiction sufficiently; otherwise this lawsuit shall be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/17/2011. (br, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Kelley v. U-Haul International, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Eric Lee Kelley |
Represented By: |
William Ora (Trip) Walton, III |
Represented By: |
Jon Cole Portis |
Represented By: |
Kendall C. Dunson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: U-Haul International, Inc. |
Represented By: |
John Banks Sewell, III |
Represented By: |
Haley Andrews Cox |
Represented By: |
Joel Chandler Bailey, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Sovran Holdings, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Eberly Transportation |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: David Walker |
Represented By: |
R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Robert Charles Ward, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Katherine Miller |
Represented By: |
Alex Lafayette Holtsford, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Teddy Lee Mann |
Represented By: |
John Robert Potter |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross_defendant: U-Haul International, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross_defendant: David Walker |
Represented By: |
Robert Charles Ward, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross_defendant: Sovran Holdings, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross_defendant: Eberly Transportation |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross_claimant: Katherine Miller |
Represented By: |
Alex Lafayette Holtsford, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Teddy Lee Mann |
Represented By: |
John Robert Potter |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?