McKeen v. U-Haul International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tiffany McKeen
Defendant: David Walker, Katherine Miller, Eberly Transportation, U-Haul International, Inc. and Sovran Holdings, Inc.
Cross_defendant: Eberly Transportation, David Walker, Sovran Holdings, Inc. and U-Haul International, Inc.
Cross_claimant: Katherine Miller
Case Number: 3:2011cv00980
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The 122 consent motion to substitute parties is granted; (2) Sovran Holdings, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice; (3) Sovran Acquisition Limited Partnership is substituted for Sovran Holdings, Inc. as a defendant; (4) Plaintiff is to file an amended complaint, that meets the requirements of this order, by no later than January 24, 2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/17/13. (scn, )
December 4, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the 104 motion for extension of deadline is granted as requested. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/4/12. (scn, )
July 6, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the 82 motion to extend time is denied, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/6/12. (scn, )
January 6, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT directing that, pursuant to the 32 Notice of Dismissal, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that defendant Eberly Transportation, d/b/a Two Men and a Truck, and the claims against it, are dismissed without prejudice, as furt her set out; The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP; Eberly Transportation, d/b/a Two Men and a Truck, is terminated as a main defendant; Said party is still in this case as a crossclaim defendant. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/6/12. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKeen v. U-Haul International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Eberly Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: David Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Sovran Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: U-Haul International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Miller
Represented By: Alex Lafayette Holtsford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eberly Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U-Haul International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sovran Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Katherine Miller
Represented By: Teddy Lee Mann
Represented By: John Robert Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany McKeen
Represented By: E Michael Moran
Represented By: Peter A Law
Represented By: William Gay Harris
Represented By: Edward Alexander Piasta
Represented By: William I Whorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?