Speir v. Astrue

Plaintiff: William Andrew Speir
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2012cv00328
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Plf's 28 Motion for Attorney Fee be and hereby is DENIED with leave to refile subject to Plf counsel's filing with the Court affidavits demonstrating the fee agreement between Plf and Plf's counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/30/2016. (wcl, )
April 29, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 5/13/2015, the Dft shall show cause why this 28 Motion for Attorney Fees is not due to be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/29/2015. (wcl, )
November 29, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Strike Erroneous Document. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/29/2012. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speir v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Andrew Speir
Represented By: Deborah Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?