Bossio v. Bishop et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Hector Manuel Bossio, Jr.
Defendant: Dora Bishop, Marc Cutt, Ray Smith and Eddie N. Lowe
Case Number: 3:2016cv00839
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Opelika Office
County: Russell
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: It is ORDERED that: 1. The 75 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. 2. The plaintiff's 78 Objections are OVERRULED. 3. The plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED. 4. This case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/13/2018. (dmn, )
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDERED that the Recommendation (Doc. # 57 ) is ADOPTED, and Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. # 1 ) is DENIED. This action is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/25/2017. (kh, )
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying 1 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order; further ORDERED that the 1 motion for a preliminary injunction is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings and a recommendation. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/24/2016. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bossio v. Bishop et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Manuel Bossio, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Cutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie N. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?