Yancey v. Richie et al (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Jonathan Yancey
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall, Patrice Richie and State of Alabama
Case Number: 3:2019cv00259
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 Supplemental ANSWER to Complaint by Steven T. Marshall, Patrice Richie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petitioner's no merit brief, #2 Exhibit B - Petitioner's pro se brief, #3 Exhibit C - Record on appeal)(Davis, John)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED that on or before June 14, 2019, Respondents shall supplement their answer to the 2254 petition with copies of the following: (1) the "no-merit brief" filed by Petitioner's counsel on direct appeal; (2) Petitioner's pro se brief on direct appeal; and (3) the record on appeal from Petitioner's Rule 32 appeal. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/30/2019. (kh, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to respondents' #10 Answer to Complaint by Jonathan Yancey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(djy, )
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing that on or before 5/29/2019, Yancey may file a response to the answer filed by respondents, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/9/19. (djy, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Correction re #10 Answer. The referenced document was replaced to modify the filer. The correct pdf is attached to this notice. (Attachments: #1 Correct pdf of #10 Answer)(dmn, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 Respondents' ANSWER to Complaint by Steven T. Marshall, Patrice Richie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpublished memo opinion - CR-15-1116, #2 Exhibit B - COJ - CR-15-1116, #3 Exhibit C - Unpublished memo opinion - CR-17-0737, #4 Exhibit D - Application for rehearing - CR-17-0737, #5 Exhibit E - Cert petition - No. 1171086, #6 Exhibit F - COJ - CR-17-0737, #7 Exhibit G - Yancey's brief on appeal - CR-17-0737, #8 Exhibit H - Lee County Circuit Court - CC-2015-000646.40)(Davis, John) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/6/2019) (dmn, ). Modified on 5/6/2019 to remove State of Alabama as a filer. (dmn, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Correction re #7 Notice of Appearance. The original pdf did not contain proper filers. The correct pdf is attached to this notice. (Attachments: #1 Correct pdf of Doc. #7 )(dmn, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steven T. Marshall, Patrice Richie. (Davis, John)
April 24, 2019 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Defendants Steven T. Marshall, and Patrice Richie. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Judson Davis on behalf of Steven T. Marshall, Patrice Richie (Davis, John) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/24/2019) (dmn, ). Modified on 4/24/2019 to correct filers in pdf. (dmn, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition and #3 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for Patrice Richie served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (dmn, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition and #3 Order signed by Olivia Hicks for Steven T. Marshall served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (dmn, )
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION: The petitioner's #2 Application for leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/11/2019. (dmn, )
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 5/3/2019 as further set out in the order. Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Patrice Richie & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/11/2019. (dmn, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jonathan Yancey. (arc, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jonathan Yancey. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Letter)(arc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yancey v. Richie et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Represented By: John Judson Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Richie
Represented By: John Judson Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Represented By: John Judson Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?