Harrison v. Toney et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: David Thomas Harrison
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall and Deborah Toney
Case Number: 3:2020cv00331
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
2 Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #1 Petition, #3 Brief and #6 Order sent to Deborah Toney was returned with the following USPS notation: "Return to Sender", "Unclaimed", Unable To Forward". (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that this #12 motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Petitioner is GRANTED an extension from July 6, 2020, to and including August 7, 2020, to show cause why his 2254 petition should not be dismissed because it was not filed within the one-year limitation period in 28 U.S.C. 2244(d) and for the other reasons asserted by Respondents in their answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/9/2020. (kh, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Enlargement of Time by David Thomas Harrison. (kh, )
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that on or before July 6, 2020, Petitioner shall show cause why his 2254 petition should not be dismissed because it was not filed within the one-year limitation period in 28 U.S.C. 2244(d) and for the other reasons asserted by Respondents in their answer, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/15/2020. (kh, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 Respondents's ANSWER to Complaint by Steven T. Marshall, Deborah Toney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CCA docket sheet - CR-14-1618, #2 Exhibit B - Harrison's brief direct appeal, #3 Exhibit C - State's brief - direct appeal, #4 Exhibit D - Harrison's reply brief - direct appeal, #5 Exhibit E - CCA memorandum opinion - direct appeal, #6 Exhibit F - CCA docket sheet - CR-18-0335, #7 Exhibit G - Appellate record - Vol. I, #8 Exhibit H - Appellate record - Vol. II, #9 Exhibit I - Harrison's brief - Rule 32 appeal, #10 Exhibit J - State's brief - Rule 32 appeal, #11 Exhibit K - CCA memorandum opinion - Rule 32 appeal, #12 Exhibit L - Harrison's application for rehearing and brief - Rule 32 appeal, #13 Exhibit M - Harrison's cert petition)(Wilkerson, Kristi)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steven T. Marshall, Deborah Toney. (Wilkerson, Kristi)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Oggs Wilkerson on behalf of Steven T. Marshall, Deborah Toney (Wilkerson, Kristi)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition, #3 Brief and #6 Order signed by Sandra B. for Steven T. Marshall served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (kh, )
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 6/12/2020; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Deborah Toney & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/21/2020. (kh, )
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION: The petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis in this habeas corpus action (Doc. #2 ) is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/21/2020. (kh, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David Thomas Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(imm, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by David Thomas Harrison. (imm, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/20/2020) (kh, ).
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by David Thomas Harrison.(imm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Toney et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Represented By: Kristi Oggs Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Toney
Represented By: Kristi Oggs Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Thomas Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?