Files v. Peters et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Earnest J. Files, Jr.
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall and Kenneth Peters
Case Number: 3:2020cv01023
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Earnest J. Files, Jr.(bes, )
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Clarify; it is ORDERED that by 1/26/2021, Petitioner must file an amendment to his 2254 Petition stating concisely (1) how his allegations concerning events between 2010 and 2012 pertain to the challenge of his 2019 Talladega County conviction for second-degree assault and (2) each ground upon which he challenges the 2019 Talladega County conviction. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 1/12/2021. (bes, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Order To Petitioner To Clarify The Specific Conviction and Specific Grounds Pertaining to That Conviction That He Intends To Challenged In The Current Habeas Petition by Steven T. Marshall, Kenneth Peters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Circuit Court Verdict Order, CC-10-283, #2 Exhibit 2 - Case action summary, CC-10-283, #3 Exhibit 3 - Files's Information Sheet at Alabama Department of Corrections, #4 Exhibit 4 - List on Alacourt showing Files's numerous cases)(Poe, Beth)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #2 Order signed by Ralph Miller for Kenneth Peters served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (bes, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Slate Poe on behalf of Steven T. Marshall, Kenneth Peters (Poe, Beth)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steven T. Marshall, Kenneth Peters. (Poe, Beth)
January 5, 2021 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Steven T. Marshall, Kenneth Peters. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition and #2 Order signed by J. Taylor for Steven T. Marshall served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (bes, )
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER HABEAS PETITION on or before 1/19/2021; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Kenneth Peters & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 12/28/2020. (bes, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 4602060577.), filed by Earnest J. Files, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Receipt)(imm, ) (Attachments 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, & 7 replaced on 12/17/2020 to redact personal identifiers previously included ) (bes, ). Modified on 12/17/2020 (bes, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Files v. Peters et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest J. Files, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Represented By: Beth Slate Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Peters
Represented By: Beth Slate Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?