Hill v. Jones et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Kendrick Omar Hill
Defendant: Jacob A. Walker, III, Steven T. Marshall, Jay Jones, Brandon Micheal Hughes and Margaret Young Brown
Case Number: 3:2021cv00133
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: it is ORDERED that by 4/27/2021, Petitioner shall show cause why his petition should not be dismissed without prejudice to allow him to exhaust his state court remedies. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/7/2021. (cwl, )
April 6, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #10 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jay Jones, Steven T. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indictment, CC-19-859, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of adjudication, CC-19-859, #3 Exhibit C - Order for Committal to Custody, CC-19-859, #4 Exhibit D - Case Action summary, CC-19-859, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Appeal to the Alabama Court of Criminal Appeals, CC-19-859, #6 Exhibit F - Ala. Court of Criminal Appeals Docket Sheet, CR-20-254, #7 Exhibit G - Ala. Court of Criminal Appeals Docketing Statement, CR-20-254, #8 Exhibit H - Notice of Extension of Time to file reporter's transcript, CR-20-254, #9 Exhibit I - Order granting additional time to file reporter's transcript, CR-20-254)(Walterscheid, Holly)
March 24, 2021 Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of #10 Amended Petition and #11 Order signed by Rodney Tabb for Jay Jones served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (bes, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly McCormac Walterscheid on behalf of Jay Jones, Steven T. Marshall (Walterscheid, Holly)
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jay Jones, Steven T. Marshall. (Walterscheid, Holly)
March 23, 2021 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for (DFTs) Jay Jones, Steven T. Marshall. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of #10 Amended Petition and #11 Order signed by Sandra B. for Steven T. Marshall served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (bes, )
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 4/6/2021; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of #10 amended petition to Sheriff Jay Jones & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/16/2021. (bes, )
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kendrick Omar Hill.(bes, )
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Hill is ORDERED to inform the Court by 3/22/2021, of his wishes to do one of the following: 1. Proceed before the Court under 28 USC 2254 on the claims in his #1 petition; or 2. Amend his petition to assert any additional claims under 28 USC 2254 on which he wishes to challenge his conviction and sentence; or 3. Withdraw his petition; the Clerk is DIRECTED to send him the form for filing a 2254 petition. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/1/2021. (bes, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 Civil filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 4602062110 (bes, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #5 Order by Kendrick Omar Hill. (bes, )
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to modify the docket to dismiss Jacob A. Walker III, Margaret Young Brown, and Brandon Michael Hughes as Dfts. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/18/2021. (bes, )
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 3/5/2021, Hill shall file a jail account statement from the account clerk at the Lee County Detention Center containing the account clerk's certified statement of the balance in Hill's jail account when he filed his habeas petition, or Hill shall submit the $5.00 filing fee; the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide the account clerk at the Lee County Detention Center with a copy of this order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/18/2021. (bes, )
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that this civil action be construed as one filed under 28 USC 2254 and this case shall henceforth proceed as such; The Clerk is DIRECTED to undertake those measures necessary to identify the instant case as one filed pursuant to 28 USC 2254. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/17/2021. (bes, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III as presiding judge; Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case. (bes, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Kendrick Omar Hill. (es, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Margaret Young Brown, Brandon Micheal Hughes, Jacob A. Walker, III, filed by Kendrick Omar Hill.(es, )
February 16, 2021 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kendrick Omar Hill. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #1 for PDF)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Jones et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob A. Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Represented By: Holly McCormac Walterscheid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Jones
Represented By: Holly McCormac Walterscheid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Micheal Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Young Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Omar Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?