Canada v. Walker et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Marquerious Laquez Canada
Defendant: Jay Jones, Jacob A. Walker, III and Steven T. Marshall
Case Number: 3:2021cv00418
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Canada is ORDERED to inform the Court by 8/9/2021, of his wishes to do one of the following: 1) Continue to proceed before this Court under 28 USC 2254 on the claims in his #1 petition; or 2) Amend his petition to assert any additional claims under 28 USC 2254 on which he wishes to challenge his conviction and sentence; or 3) Withdraw his petition. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/9/2021. (amf, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee received re #1 Petition: $ 5.00, receipt number 4602063833. (amf, )
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 7/12/2021, Petitioner shall either file (1) a properly completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by his jail account statement from the account clerk at the Lee County Detention Center or (2) the $5.00 filing fee; The Clerk is DIRECTED to SEND Petitioner a form for filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/22/2021. (bes, )
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that this civil action be construed as one filed under 28 USC 2254 and this case shall henceforth proceed as such; DIRECTING the Clerk to undertake those measures necessary to identify the instant case as one filed pursuant to 28 USC 2254. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/22/2021. (amf, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Marquerious Laquez Canada. (hrs, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 (STRICKEN; CONVERTED TO 28 USC 2254 PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #3 ORDER) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Jacob A. Walker, III, filed by Marquerious Laquez Canada.(hrs, ) Modified on 6/22/2021 (amf, ).
June 17, 2021 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Marquerious Laquez Canada. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canada v. Walker et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob A. Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquerious Laquez Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?