Vincent L Rowell, Estate of et al v. Walker Baptist Medical Center et al

Plaintiff: Vincent L Rowell, Estate of, Heracio Pickett, Victor Pickett and Linda Rowell
Defendant: Walker Baptist Medical Center, David Williamson, John Tirey, Trent McClusky, Long, Harper, Greg Glover, DeJesus, T J Burnette, Clint McKinney, Sumiton, City of, Alfred Grace, Ray Hodge, Walker County Commission, Sonya Gold, Tonya Fleming, David Wilson and Gold Medical Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv03439
Filed: September 22, 2011
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Northeastern Office
County: Walker
Presiding Judge: Robert R Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2015 187 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, re 167 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by the Walker County Defendants. The motion is fully briefed and ripe for review. For the reasons stated, the Walker County Defendants' motion to dismiss the second amended complaint is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 5/22/15. (CTS, )
January 30, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the defendants' motions for reconsideration are OVERRULED and DENIED, and the Clerk is directed to return this case to the Magistrate Judge to whom it was assigned when filed for all further proceedings up to and, if the parties consent, through trial, as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 1/29/2013. (AHI)
June 25, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court OPIONONS AND REASONS that this court sustains plaintiffs' objections, and rejects the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is ORDERED that defendants motions to dismiss are DENIED, insofar as they were founded on plaintiffs' alleged lack of standing, it is further ORDERED that the Clerk return this case to the Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings; as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 6/25/2012. (AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincent L Rowell, Estate of et al v. Walker Baptist Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent L Rowell, Estate of
Represented By: Earl F Hilliard
Represented By: Melvin Robinson
Represented By: Antonio L Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heracio Pickett
Represented By: Earl F Hilliard
Represented By: Melvin Robinson
Represented By: Antonio L Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Pickett
Represented By: Earl F Hilliard
Represented By: Melvin Robinson
Represented By: Antonio L Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Rowell
Represented By: Earl F Hilliard
Represented By: Melvin Robinson
Represented By: Antonio L Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker Baptist Medical Center
Represented By: Jasper P Juliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Williamson
Represented By: Richard E Crum
Represented By: Steadman S Shealy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tirey
Represented By: Tina A Burgett
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Represented By: Kendrick E Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent McClusky
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Represented By: Kendrick E Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Represented By: Kendrick E Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harper
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Glover
Represented By: Herbie Brewer
Represented By: Hugh Cannon Lawley
Represented By: T Kelly May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeJesus
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Represented By: Kendrick E Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T J Burnette
Represented By: Hugh Cannon Lawley
Represented By: T Kelly May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint McKinney
Represented By: Herbie Brewer
Represented By: Hugh Cannon Lawley
Represented By: T Kelly May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumiton, City of
Represented By: Hugh Cannon Lawley
Represented By: T Kelly May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Grace
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Represented By: Kendrick E Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker County Commission
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Represented By: Kendrick E Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Gold
Represented By: Herbie Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?