Chambliss v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Linda Chambliss
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2007cv00360
Filed: May 18, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Linda Chambliss, recommending that the motion for attorney fees be granted. Petitioner is authorized to receive $5,737.35 as a fee for services rendered at the federal court level which represents the remaining balance of twenty-five percent (25%) of the total past-due benefits awarded Plaintiff. Additionally, Petitioner is hereby DIRECTED to disburse to Plaintiff the sum of $3,100.94 which was previously awarded pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/2/09. (cmj)
March 16, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Linda Chambliss, recommending that the motion for attorney fees be granted as set out. Objections to R&R due by 3/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 3/13/09. (cmj)
December 19, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Linda Chambliss against Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/19/08. (cmj)
December 3, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) filed by Linda Chambliss, recommending the motion be granted for a total EAJA award of $3100.94 as set out. Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/2/08. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambliss v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Chambliss
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?