Wiley v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Jason Wiley
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2007cv00663
Filed: September 18, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Jason Wiley against Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/15/09. (cmj)
March 16, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Jason Wiley, recommending that the decision of the Commissioner of SS denying plaintiff's claim for period of disability and disability income benefits be reversed and remanded for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/16/09. (notification to SSA) (cmj)
March 2, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Jason Wiley, recommending that the decision of the Commissioner of SS, denying plaintiff's claim for period of disability and disability income benefits be reversed and remanded for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 3/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/27/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiley v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Wiley
Represented By: Colin Edward Kemmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?