Taylor v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Ralph Taylor, III
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2007cv00768
Filed: October 29, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Ralph Taylor, III as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/10/2012. (cmj)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) filed by Ralph Taylor, III, recommending that Plaintiff's counsel be awarded $4,000 in attorneys fees under EAJA. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/9/09. (cmj)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) filed by Ralph Taylor, III, recommending that Plaintiff's counsel be awarded $4,000 in attorneys fees under EAJA Objections to R&R due by 12/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/19/09. (cmj)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT reversing and remanded this action for further proceedings.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/09. (cmj)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Ralph Taylor, III, recommending that the decision of the Commissioner be REVERSED and REMANDED. Objections to R&R due by 9/15/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/28/09. (cmj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Taylor, III
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?