McCann v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Barbara A. McCann
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2008cv00078
Filed: February 7, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Barbara A. McCann as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/10/09. (cmj)
November 4, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Barbara A. McCann stating that Petitioner be authorized to receive, as an attorney's fee pursuant to Section 406(b) for services rendered at the federal court level, the sum of $1,581.10 as set out. The Magistrate Judge further RECOMMENDS upon receipt of this award, Petitioner should refund to Plaintiff the EAJA fee award of $2,669.72 which was previously awarded pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act ("EAJA"). Objections to R&R due by 11/19/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/3/09. Copies to parties on 11/4/09. (mpp)
November 24, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) filed by Barbara A. McCann, recommending the motion be granted and that plaintiff receive an attorney's fee in the amount of $2669.72. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/21/08. (cmj)
November 5, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) filed by Barbara A. McCann, recommending the motion be granted and that plaintiff receive an attorney's fee in the amount of $2669.72. Objections to R&R due by 11/20/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/5/08. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCann v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A. McCann
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?