Coates v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Geraldine C. Coates
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2008cv00091
Filed: February 14, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Clarke
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Pet is authorized to receive $7,528.50 as a fee for services as set out, & Pet is DIRECTED to disburse to Plf the sum of $3,239.19, which was previously awarded pursuant to EAJA. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/13/09. (tot)
July 29, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the 26 MOTION for Attorney Fees be GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART & recommending that Pet be authorized to receive an attny's fee in the sum of $7,528.50 as set out, & further recommending entry of an order directing Pet to disburse to Plf the sum of $3,239.19 as set out. Objections to R&R due by 8/12/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 7/29/09. (tot)
January 6, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Petitioner be awarded attny's fees under the EAJA in the amount of $3,239.19. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/6/09. (tot)
December 18, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plf's 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act be GRANTED, & that she be awarded attny fees in the amount of $3,239.19 as set out. Objections to R&R due by 1/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/18/08. (tot)
September 29, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Dft's 16 Unopposed MOTION & Memorandum for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. Sec. 405(g) w/Remand is GRANTED, & this action is REMANDED to the SSA as set out. This remand makes Plf a prevailing party for purposes of the EAJA. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/29/08. (tot)
September 4, 2008 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Dft's 16 Unopposed MOTION to Remand be GRANTED, & that this Court enter judgment reversing & remanding this cause to the Commissioner for action consistent w/the Dft's motion. Objections to R&R due by 9/24/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/4/08. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coates v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine C. Coates
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?