Dotson v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Mattie T. Dotson
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2008cv00095
Filed: February 14, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plf's Motion for Award of Attny's Fees is GRANTED, & Plf is AWARDED an attny's fee in the amount of $2,000.00. No costs are taxed. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/27/09. (tot)
January 8, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plf's 23 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act be granted, & that Plf be awarded an EAJA attny's fee in the amount of $2,000.00. Objections to R&R due by 1/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/8/09. (tot)
November 18, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security denying claimant benefits be reversed & remanded to the Commissioner as set out. The remand pursuant to sentence four of Section 405(g) makes Plf a prevailing party for purposes of EAJA & terminates this Court's jurisdiction over this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/18/08. (tot)
October 30, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that a final judgment be entered ordering remand in this action pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. Sec. 405(g). Objections to R&R due by 11/14/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 10/30/08. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dotson v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie T. Dotson
Represented By: E. Mark Ezell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?