Will-Burn Recording & Publishing Co. et al v. Universal Music Group Records et al

Plaintiff: Will-Burn Recording & Publishing Co., Willie Ash and Morris Barnes
Defendant: Universal Music Group Records, Universal Records, Inc., Cash Money Records, Young Money Publishings, Universal Motown Records Group, IG Records, Inc., Universal Music Group Distribution, The Inc. Records, Young Goldie Music, Lloyd Harlin Polite, Jr., Dwayne Carter, Jasper Cameron, Maurice "Big Reese Sinclair, Phalon Anton Alexander, Johnta Austin, Sho'Nuff Recordings, LLC and Irving Lorenzo
Case Number: 1:2008cv00387
Filed: July 3, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 Motion to Consolidate. Lead Case No.: 08-0387-WS-N, Member Case No.: 09-0287-WS-N, All future pleadings to be filed in the Lead Case. The Clerk is directed to extract documents 1-15 from Civil Action No. 09-0287-WS-N, make those documents a part of the court file in Civil Action No. 08-0387-WS-N & statistically close case 09-287. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 7/10/09. (tgw)
April 27, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING the 80 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss as to Warner/Chappell Music. The Court reconsiders its Order (doc. 55) of February 5, 2009, which allowed plaintiffs to file an amended complaint joining Warner/Chappell as an additional defendant. The Second Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice insofar as it asserts claims against Warner/Chappell. All of plaintiffs' causes of action against Warner/Chappell are dismissed without prejudice (Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. terminated as a party). Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 4/24/09. (tgw)
January 26, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Entry of Default. Plaintiffs' request that the Clerk enter a default against defendants Sho Nuff Recordings, LLC, Johnta Austin, Jasper Cameron and Young Money Publishings is granted, a nd the Clerk is directed to do so. However, plaintiffs' request for entry of default judgment as to those defendants is denied as premature for the reasons stated. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 1/26/09. Copy mailed to defendants as set out. (tgw)
November 4, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING the 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants filed by Will-Burn Recording & Publishing Co. The Rule 4(m) deadline for service of process on defendants Carter, Austin, Cameron, Alexander, Sinclair and Young Money Publishings is extended to 12/31/2008. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 11/4/08. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Will-Burn Recording & Publishing Co. et al v. Universal Music Group Records et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will-Burn Recording & Publishing Co.
Represented By: Richard H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Ash
Represented By: Richard H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Barnes
Represented By: Richard H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Records, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash Money Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Money Publishings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Motown Records Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IG Records, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group Distribution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Inc. Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Goldie Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Harlin Polite, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasper Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice "Big Reese Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phalon Anton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnta Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sho'Nuff Recordings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irving Lorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?